HEATHLANDS PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (WEST BERGHOLT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils at Heathlands Primary School through raising funds at various events to support the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £4,641 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
Governance
- 06 May 1994: Standard registration
- HEATHLANDS SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kielye Louise Mitchell | Chair | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jayne Dobson | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Claire Bull | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carrie-Ann Swinger | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosey Francis | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Graham | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.35k | £8.94k | £14.83k | £56.51k | £40.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.41k | £6.83k | £21.05k | £37.76k | £40.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH MAY 1993 as amended on 10 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WEST BERGHOLT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heathlands Primary School
New Church Road
West Bergholt
COLCHESTER
CO6 3JF
- Phone:
- 01206240288
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window