Accounts and annual returns PUDDLEDUCKS UNDER FIVES

Charity Number: 1037296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 September 2024 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 April 2024 304 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 April 2024 304 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 April 2024 669 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 April 2024 669 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 August 2020 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 07 August 2020 38 days late Download Open in new window