Financial history PUDDLEDUCKS UNDER FIVES

Charity Number: 1037296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £119.50k £119.34k £124.43k £57.75k £0
Total expenditure £108.90k £104.94k £118.31k £95.57k £4.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £104.19k £98.62k £105.36k £46.91k N/A