HOWDEN PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provider of pre-school education for children from 2 to 5 years of age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Total income includes £105,048 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 05 May 1994: Standard registration
- 08 April 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 08 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1200076 EARLY EXPLORERS COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOLS
- HOWDEN PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE (Working name)
- HOWDEN PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.94k | £70.93k | £139.59k | £185.27k | £180.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.12k | £79.42k | £120.14k | £184.54k | £178.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £43.09k | N/A | £129.93k | £105.05k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 July 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 July 2022 | 26 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 September 2020 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 September 2020 | 92 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/02/1976 AS AMENDED ON 15/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window