Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF HUGHENDEN PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1037344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 15 August 2022 06 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 15 August 2021 14 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 15 August 2020 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 15 August 2019 09 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2019 Not Required