Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF BODMIN TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1037346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £8.22k £6.78k £18.94k £17.02k £14.01k
Total expenditure £12.38k £4.59k £14.76k £20.21k £17.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £6.12k N/A