Financial history THE FRIENDS OF PENDOCK SCHOOL

Charity number: 1037355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £12.03k £10.36k £7.54k £10.98k £8.26k
Total expenditure £14.50k £17.58k £3.82k £10.82k £6.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A