SOUTH HETTON AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association provides a wide range of activities for all age groups within South Hetton and its surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £29,439 from 14 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 06 May 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL CHARTERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christopher Baird | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dorn | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karl Wass | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Todd | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.40k | £54.65k | £72.18k | £75.34k | £98.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.80k | £42.82k | £58.72k | £74.45k | £93.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.66k | £45.50k | £29.43k | £17.75k | £29.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 1983 AS AMENDED 19 APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
A.TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH HETTON BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE INHABITANTS, TO ADVANCE AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION.B.TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
SOUTH HETTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Robin Todd Centre
Front Street
South Hetton
DURHAM
DH6 2TH
- Phone:
- 0191 5260520
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window