Financial history THE HERTFORD COUNTY ASSOCIATION OF CHANGE RINGERS

Charity number: 1037400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.63k £7.25k £7.53k £5.58k £10.13k
Total expenditure £5.69k £5.85k £6.85k £6.92k £5.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A