THE ST. ALBANS CATHEDRAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To fundraise for the preservation, repair, maintenance, restoration, improvement and ornamentation of and addition to the fabric of the Cathedral and Abbey Church of St Alban. The charity is currently dormant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 13 May 1994: Standard registration
- THE FABRIC TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Field | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
THE VERY REVD JOANNE KELLY-MOORE | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
MARY MINTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120 | £145 | £120 | £645 | £120 | |
|
Total expenditure | £120 | £145 | £120 | £645 | £120 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 MARCH 1994 as amended on 25 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, RESTORATION, IMPROVEMENT, AND ORNAMENTATION OF AND ADDITION OF THE FABRIC OF THE CATHEDRAL AND ABBEY CHURCH OF ST. ALBANS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE ST. ALBANS HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Albans Cathedral
Sumpter Yard
St Albans
AL1 1BY
- Phone:
- 01727 890200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window