ORCHARD PARK PRE-SCHOOL (YORK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Orchard Park Preschool provides childcare to children aged between 2 and 4 year's old. Orchard park preschool thrive's on watching the children develop from small little children to independant young people getting ready to start their next journey to primary school. Orchard Park Preschool is run by professional staff who are all trained to at least a level 3 qualification.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- City Of York
Governance
- 09 May 1994: Standard registration
- 07 July 2020: Funds received from 1026099 HUNTINGTON PRE-SCHOOL
- ORCHARD PARK PLAYGROUP (YORK) (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Wood | Chair | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Smith | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Verity Grantham | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Jobling | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Joanne Leaf | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.53k | £82.39k | £69.64k | £93.68k | £79.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.46k | £71.19k | £78.05k | £86.32k | £86.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 30/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 15/01/2013
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Orhard Park Community Centre
Badger Paddock
Huntington
York
yo31 9eh
- Phone:
- 07407700315
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window