Financial history ST ANNE'S HOSTEL

Charity number: 1037430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £776.66k £822.68k £773.20k £770.90k £1.04m
Total expenditure £665.58k £734.85k £774.19k £834.38k £928.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £124.83k £125.34k £120.27k £121.52k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £649.72k £695.70k £651.55k £647.44k £848.05k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £2.11k £1.64k £1.38k £1.94k £187.31k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £648.15k £711.56k £739.08k £803.05k £910.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.08k £13.64k £14.80k £17.39k £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.55k £2.60k £3.72k £5.16k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £5.35k £9.66k £20.31k £13.94k £17.47k