Accounts and annual returns ALICE BARKER TRUST

Charity Number: 1037444
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2009 23 February 2010 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required