ALICE BARKER TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Active help, advice and information, for those who are disabled, ill, dying or bereaved. Free information on any type of funeral choices. Burials in nature reserves. Wildlife conservation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 May 1994: Standard registration
- 09 October 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- ALICE BARKER WELFARE & WILDLIFE TRUST (Previous name)
- ALICE BARKER WELFARE & WILDLIFE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- ALICE BARKER WILDLIFE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.32k | £9.08k | £8.97k | £8.62k | £8.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.84k | £6.46k | £7.41k | £6.45k | £6.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 23 February 2010 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 APRIL 1994 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25 APRIL 1997 AND RESOLUTION DATED 9 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO MAKE PROVISION FOR BURIALS (INCLUDING THE SAFE BURIAL OF PETS) IN SPECIFIC NATURE RESERVES MAINTAINED BY THE TRUST; 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, THE PROMOTION AND CONSERVATION OF INDIGENOUS WILDLIFE AND WILDLIFE HABITATS IN BRITAIN AND ELSEWHERE; 3. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window