NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE MUSIC AND DRAMA FESTIVAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual music and drama festival held in Brigg, Lincs, for competitors of all ages. Many of our competitors are school children who benefit and gain confidence from performing in front of an audience. Apart from the war and Covid years, the Festival has been encouraging children and adults to share their talents since 1900. 2023 will hopefully see the 100th Festival.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 17 May 1994: Standard registration
- BRIGG FESTIVAL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAYNE ELIZABETH KEELER | Chair | 08 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Frances Earl | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Katherine Stapley | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Huw Edward Davies | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jemima Kelly | Trustee | 08 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.34k | £87 | £1 | £11.68k | £4.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.73k | £1.69k | £50 | £10.03k | £3.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 November 2023 | 242 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 04 October 2022 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 FEBRUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF MUSIC, SPEECH AND DRAMA AND DANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Fox Terrace
Ealand
SCUNTHORPE
DN17 4JL
- Phone:
- 07875601484
- Email:
- nlincsfestival@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window