FAIR HAVEN HOUSING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and help to maintain homes for people with learning disabilities resident on the Isle of Wight, and to make financial grants to the residents or other people with learning disabilities at the discretion of the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 13 May 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR A PORTEOUS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rosemary Ann Marsh | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Dunn | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Allen | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Hamflett | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Talbot | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Adrian Talbot | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS R MARSH | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR S OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS J BOGONI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.11k | £3.10k | £3.08k | £3.63k | £4.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.92k | £5.60k | £5.19k | £5.89k | £7.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 APRIL 1994 AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OR PERSONS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND/OR MENTAL HANDICAP WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN AT ANY TIME RESIDENT IN THE ISLE OF WIGHT PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTAL CARE AND BY MAKING FINANCIAL GRANTS OR LOANS (INCLUDING THE LOANS OF CHATTELS OR PROPERTY) ON SUCH TERMS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT TO: (A) TO SUCH PERSONS EITHER COLLECTIVELY OR INDIVIDUALLY (B) FAIRHAVEN HOUSING PART OF ISLE OF WIGHT SOCIETY OR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATION PROVIDING CARE AND SUPPORT FOR ANY SUCH PERSON (C) ANY OTHER PERSON OR BODY PROVIDING CARE OR SUPPORT FOR ANY SUCH PERSON.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
Dover House
7 The Strand
RYDE
PO33 1JD
- Phone:
- 01983565696
- Email:
- r.marsh261@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window