CITIZENS ADVICE SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE

Charity number: 1037480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity's objects are to promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of the community in South Gloucestershire and surrounding areas by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Bristol City
  • Gloucestershire
  • North Somerset
  • South Gloucestershire
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 May 1994: Standard registration
  • 14 September 2020: Funds received from 1071380 JR AND SA BROOKS CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • NORTHAVON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
  • SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Wilhelmina Maria Blikmans Trustee 12 November 2024
None on record
Geoffrey Colin Williams Trustee 13 August 2024
None on record
Shaun Patrick Murphy Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Deborah Webb Trustee 07 February 2024
None on record
Michael John Haskell Trustee 18 February 2023
None on record
John-Paul Corry Trustee 08 December 2022
None on record
George Leach Trustee 01 August 2018
THE ROMAN BATHS FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £544.68k £540.54k £560.52k £498.77k £827.77k
Total expenditure £467.60k £471.80k £545.17k £576.99k £817.79k
Income from government contracts £283.05k £270.92k £295.19k £193.81k £410.21k
Income from government grants £32.72k £28.59k £60.77k £40.73k £381.13k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £15.44k £3.77k N/A £28.65k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £524.80k £556.67k N/A £797.17k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £1.23k £291 £79 N/A £1.96k
Income - Other £543.46k £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £467.60k £471.80k £545.17k N/A £815.63k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A £2.16k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.64k £3.86k N/A £21.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £2.41k £7.01k £3.80k N/A £10.57k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Other assets £347.96k £418.82k £431.36k N/A £380.64k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Total liabilities £30.10k £36.82k £30.82k N/A £55.11k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
South Gloucestershire Citizens
Advice Bureau
Kennedy Way
Yate
BRISTOL
BS37 4DQ
Phone:
01454334961