ST ANDREW'S SCHOOL HELPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise fund raising events. e.g. school fete, Christmas bazaar, Christmas calendars and so on to raise funds to purchase items for the children attending the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Essex
Governance
- 13 May 1994: Standard registration
- S A S H A (Working name)
- S.A.S.H.A. (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Coverdale | Chair | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte King | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Williams | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Pears | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie McDermott | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bridgette Gough | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.36k | £5.55k | £435 | £0 | £405 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.45k | £8.35k | £935 | £1.52k | £1.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 June 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 March 2021 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
BRAINTREE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Andrews C Of E School
Mathews Close
HALSTEAD
Essex
CO9 2BH
- Phone:
- 07783990054
- Email:
- SASHA@st-andrewscofe.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window