Accounts and annual returns NETHER STOWEY SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1037544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 25 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 March 2024 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required