NEWPORT PAGNELL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1037556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting either generally or individually the education of persons who are resident in the Parish of Newport Pagnell and who are in need of financial assistance.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,288
Total expenditure: £1,600

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Milton Keynes

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 May 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr EUAN HENDERSON Chair
THE NEWPORT PAGNELL AND DISTRICT YOUTH CLUB
Received: On time
THE MAASAI ASSOCIATION UK TRUST
Received: On time
ROTARY CLUB OF MILTON KEYNES CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Jennifer Mazzone Trustee 12 May 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL WITH ST LUKE, NEWPORT PAGNELL
Received: On time
RICHARD CHARLES SMITH Trustee 19 March 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL WITH ST LUKE, NEWPORT PAGNELL
Received: On time
Rev Nick Evans Trustee 22 February 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL WITH ST LUKE, NEWPORT PAGNELL
Received: On time
TOWN LANDS
Received: On time
Diane Kitchen Trustee 22 February 2016
TOWN LANDS
Received: On time
CATHERINE HALL Trustee 09 February 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £955 £936 £924 £1.09k £1.29k
Total expenditure £2.59k £2.10k £1.20k £1.19k £1.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Peter & St. Pauls Church
High Street
Newport Pagnell
MK16 8AR
Phone:
01908611145