Governing document INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF ANTIQUE SCALE COLLECTORS (EUROPE)
Charity Number: 1037558
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 OCTOBER 1993 AS AMENDED 7 MARCH 1994, 7 OCTOBER 2001 AND 20 OCTOBER 2002. as amended on 22 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING ALL HISTORICAL, TECHNICAL, CULTURAL AND AESTHETIC ASPECTS OF MEASUREMENT BY WEIGHING.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.