ST WINEFRIDE'S SCHOOL SHREWSBURY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The schools ethos is to cater for as many children from as wide a social background as is possible. The relatively low fee structure reflects this. The school has no selective entry policy. The school supports some children who could not otherwise afford full fees. The school supports the local community by allowing groups eg church groups - use of the hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£604,243
Donations and legacies | £98.77k | |
Charitable activities | £494.70k | |
Other trading activities | £999 | |
Investments | £9.77k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£757,442
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £757.44k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £98,181 from 9 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £757.44k |
People

21 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 17 May 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swinitha Ranusha Ayan Thevathasan | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annette Taylor | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christopher Paul Matthews | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
EDMUND WILLIAM JOHN COXHEAD | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Ostrowski | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edward tate | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Strong | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £713.52k | £637.14k | £559.53k | £474.38k | £604.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £661.33k | £650.03k | £690.34k | £689.76k | £757.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £73.34k | £126.49k | £66.97k | £84.24k | £98.18k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £8.19k | £33.95k | N/A | £98.77k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £37.47k | £22.33k | £0 | N/A | £999 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £670.91k | £581.46k | £525.43k | N/A | £494.70k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.13k | £3.71k | £151 | N/A | £9.77k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £21.46k | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £622.92k | £650.03k | £690.34k | N/A | £757.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £38.41k | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.05k | £8.92k | £13.04k | N/A | £7.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £380.18k | £386.02k | £363.70k | N/A | £333.44k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.09m | £1.07m | £1.17m | N/A | £846.46k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £25.32k | £29.68k | £232.58k | N/A | £251.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 April 2025 | 281 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 April 2025 | 281 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 September 2022 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 September 2022 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 DECEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR SUCH CHARITABLE WORKS AS ADVANCE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR TO ACQUIRE PROVIDE CONDUCT AND DEVELOP INDEPENDENT ROMAN CATHOLIC SCHOOLS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SHREWSBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. WINEFRIDES SCHOOL
BELMONT
SHREWSBURY
SY1 1TE
- Phone:
- 01743 369883
- Email:
- st.winefrides@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window