Trustees ST WINEFRIDE'S SCHOOL SHREWSBURY TRUST

Charity Number: 1037597
Charity reporting is up to date (281 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Swinitha Ranusha Ayan Thevathasan Trustee 26 April 2024
None on record
Annette Taylor Trustee 06 September 2023
None on record
Rev Christopher Paul Matthews Trustee 06 April 2022
None on record
EDMUND WILLIAM JOHN COXHEAD Trustee 06 April 2022
None on record
Stephen John Ostrowski Trustee 23 October 2019
None on record
Edward tate Trustee 26 March 2014
None on record
Patrick Strong Trustee 12 December 2013
None on record