HIBALDSTOW PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provider of Pre-School educational provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 20 May 1994: Standard registration
- 16 April 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- HIBALDSTOW UNDER FIVES PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.20k | £30.12k | £20.19k | £22.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.93k | £36.29k | £21.28k | £20.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 16 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window