BILLERICAY CATHOLIC PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE PRE-SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN AGED 2 1/2 - 5 YEARS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £92,206 from 1 government contract(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 18 May 1994: Standard registration
- BILLERICAY CATHOLIC PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Godfree | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marilena Luxmoore | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wilson | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Walker | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Thorne | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Nolan | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Amos | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Billie Foyle | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thalia Beckwith | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Venables | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Kelly | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.66k | £82.27k | £105.08k | £121.38k | £144.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.42k | £78.01k | £96.38k | £109.43k | £125.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £60.80k | £48.03k | £76.71k | £92.21k | |
|
Income from government grants | £61.01k | N/A | £2.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 July 2020 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 July 2020 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION 2 AUGUST 2016
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Canon Roche Hall co The Most Holy Redeemer
21 Laindon Road
BILLERICAY
Essex
CM12 9LL
- Phone:
- 07980411925
- Email:
- treasurerbcps@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window