Financial history ROMANOFF FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1037622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £9.98k £10.18k £29.80k £11.71k £25.19k
Total expenditure £10.22k £17.05k £22.46k £13.63k £12.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A