Trustees 3RD WASHINGTON (DONWELL) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1037623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tracy Margaret Wood Trustee 07 November 2024
None on record
Evie Tait Trustee 07 September 2023
None on record
Matthew Willcock Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
John Dunbar Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Stephen Harrison Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Carl Hickman Trustee
None on record