Financial history TOTTENHAM GREEN COMMUNITY NURSERY

Charity number: 1037628
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £94.73k £149.49k £153.21k £128.96k £145.16k
Total expenditure £147.68k £119.74k £138.62k £135.52k £161.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £105.38k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A