Financial history BINSTEAD COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037632
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £7.48k £9.06k £9.88k £2.73k £0
Total expenditure £5.00k £10.56k £9.51k £2.67k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A