ROTHERHAM UNIT 287 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering a structured programme of training and activities to develop skills in seamanship and many different disciplines, through education & learning, including the Duke of Edinburgh Award scheme which can be used in their future life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Rotherham
Governance
- 17 May 1994: Standard registration
- T.S. REPULSE (Working name)
- ROTHERHAM UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS NO.287 (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HAMPSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Jane Lynock | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Connolly | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Austin Maltby | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Maltby | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Craig Cottam | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Rene Ralph Green | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronald William Moffett MBE | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Kelsall | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Green | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH HAMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.66k | £24.03k | £11.28k | £5.38k | £6.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.30k | £4.26k | £9.22k | £9.31k | £17.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.30k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADT REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 WOODALL ROAD
ROTHERHAM
S65 3AT
- Phone:
- 01709308252
- Email:
- hampson.dj@blueyonder.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window