Governing document ASHBEIAN MUSICAL THEATRE GROUP
Charity number: 1037694

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 10 MAY 1994 AND 22 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED ON 23 JUN 2015 as amended on 21 Jun 2018 as amended on 07 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE TO EDUCATE AND ENTERTAIN THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF DRAMATIC AND MUSICAL ARTS, AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF ITS MEMBERS’ AND THE PUBLIC’S APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.