AIDS IMPACT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HIV and AIDS EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES, ESPECIALLY ORGANIZATION OF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCES ON PSYCHOLOGICAL AND SOCIAL ISSUES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Australia
- Botswana
- Netherlands
- South Africa
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 19 May 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Kathryn Steventon | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard Harding-Swale | Trustee | 16 December 2015 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR LUCIE CLUVER | Trustee | 16 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr LORRAINE SHERR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JOSE CATALAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £399 | £7.14k | £1.96k | £114.12k | £2.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.89k | £27.42k | £14.40k | £37.76k | £36.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION ABOUT THE BIOPSYCHOSOCIAL ASPECTS AND PROBLEMS OF HIV INFECTION PARTICULARLY BY THE HOLDING OF AN INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 HENWOOD
WOOTTON
BOARS HILL
OXFORD
OX1 5JX
- Phone:
- 02073812100
- Email:
- j.catalan@talk21.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window