FRIENDS OF THE CLINTON SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES TO ASSIST IN ADVANCING AND ENHANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT OUR SMALL SCHOOL IN DEVON
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 23 May 1994: Standard registration
- CLINTON SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryony Knapman | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Mann | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNAH ROSE QUICK | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £179 | £276 | £1.88k | £1.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £532 | £950 | £500 | £1.21k | £890 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 13 APRIL 1994 AND AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 3 NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE-THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Clinton C of E Primary School
Merton
OKEHAMPTON
EX20 3EQ
- Phone:
- 01805603357
- Email:
- admin@clinton.devon.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window