THE FMRC CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of medical research and the provision of finance and assistance for the acquisition of medical equipment at the Felsenstein Medical Centre in co-operation with the medical department of Tel-Aviv University and the Beilinson Medical Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 20 May 1994: Standard registration
- 08 April 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE FELSENSTEIN MEDICAL RESEARCH CENTRE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.50k | £3.37k | £3.42k | £3.00k | £29.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.80k | £29.57k | £35.15k | £30.64k | £1.35m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 20 February 2020 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | 20 February 2020 | 15 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 05 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 02 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE STUDIES AND ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH; DEVELOPMENT OF EDUCATIONAL TOOLS AND REPORTS FOR ADVANCING MEDICAL KNOWLEDGE; DEVELOPMENT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH LIBRARY AND DATA BASE TO ATTRACT AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCHERS OF AN INTERNATIONAL STANDARD; PUBLICATION AND CIRCULATION OF REPORTS DEALING WITH RESEARCH AND MEDICAL DEVELOPMENTS; SPONSORSHIP OF INTERNATIONAL SEMINARS; (B)FOR THE PURPOSES AFORESAID TO FINANCE AND/OR ASSIST IN THE ACQUISITION OF MEDICAL AND OTHER EQUIPMENT, SUPPLIES AND MATERIALS, AND THE CONSTRUCTION OF NEW AND IMPROVED EXPERIMENTAL APPARATUS INTENDED TO BE USEFUL IN TREATMENT OF DISEASE; (C)TO PROMOTE THE CARRYING OUT OF SUCH ACTIVITIES AS AFORESAID OR ANY PART THEREOF BY THE FELSENSTEIN MEDICAL RESEARCH CENTRE OF ISRAEL AND TO COLLABORATE WITH ANY OTHER CHARITY OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IN THE CARRYING OUT OF SUCH ACTIVITIES OR ANY PART THEREOF.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, ISRAEL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window