STOBOROUGH NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a caring and stimulating environment for children aged 2.5 to the year they enter School. We are funded by fee paying parents, Government funding for qualifying children, grants and donations. We have 8 paid staff and a voluntary committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
Total income includes £89,043 from 1 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 23 May 1994: Standard registration
- STOBOROUGH PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ella Scrymgeour | Chair | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Cook | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Courtney Loughnane | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aldona Frelik | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kesia Watkins-Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Iles | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Clarke | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hodgetts | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Blacker | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Gallagher | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/04/2020 | 07/04/2021 | 07/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.96k | £105.48k | £116.37k | £117.37k | £136.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.92k | £97.47k | £91.46k | £97.04k | £98.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £67.82k | £89.04k | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.25k | £22.95k | £76.49k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 April 2022 | 30 March 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2022 | 30 March 2023 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 April 2021 | 13 February 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2021 | 13 February 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 22 May 2015
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stobourgh Nursery School
Corfe Road
Stoborough
WAREHAM
Dorset
BH20 5AD
- Phone:
- 07796 297701
- Email:
- emma.cahill@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window