ST AGNES SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To protect against loss of life at sea through education, training and action. To represent and promote the sports of surf lifesaving and surfing in St Agnes. To encourage the safe enjoyment of the coastal enviroment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 20 May 1994: Standard registration
- ST AGNES SURF CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Carter | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Powell | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOEL WILLIAM OWEN HENTHORN | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Steven Mark Havers | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.51k | £55.62k | £65.09k | £57.90k | £67.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.96k | £47.74k | £43.32k | £57.22k | £69.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.83k | £16.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 August 2024 | 286 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 August 2024 | 286 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 February 2024 | 851 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2021 | 384 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2021 | 384 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE CLUB IS TO SAVE LIFE WHETHER BY PREVENTION OR BY RESCUE FROM THE BEACH.
Area of benefit
ST AGNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Polbreen Avenue
St. Agnes
TR5 0TR
- Phone:
- 01872552357
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window