HEATONS-REDDISH GROUP U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Classes in Architecture, Art, Bird Watching, Current Affairs, Crafts, Drama, Family History, Gardening, Heritage, Line Dancing, Literature, Music Appreciation, Play Reading, Poetry, Science, Singing, Ukulele, Walking, Writing; theatre visits and interest holidays, Philosophy, Conversational Spanish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Stockport
Governance
- 19 May 1994: Standard registration
- HEATONS REDDISH U3A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Mitchell | Chair | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Rogers | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Deanna Selby | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Penelope Jackson Hewitt | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Lloyd | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Walker | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Jude Wells | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Moorhouse | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Zita Downing | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Needham | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA DUNNE | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.77k | £8.17k | £12.25k | £21.74k | £21.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.50k | £7.63k | £10.97k | £19.55k | £20.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 SEPTEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED 13 APRIL 1994, 29 OCTOBER 1997, 20 NOVEMBER 2000 AND 19 NOVEMBER 2001. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 28 Sep 2020 as amended on 28 Sep 2020 as amended on 15 Mar 2021 as amended on 18 Jul 2022 as amended on 18 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
HEATONS-REDDISH AND THE SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 Buckingham Road
STOCKPORT
Cheshire
SK4 4QY
- Phone:
- 07812859492
- Email:
- cmtcl@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window