INTERNATIONAL BOATBUILDING TRAINING COLLEGE SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1037773
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Total income: £121
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 20 May 1994: Standard registration
- 29 August 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- I B T C S F (Working name)
- IBTCSF (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 22 October 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING SCHOLARSHIPS TO BE AWARDED TO STUDENTS ATTENDING THE INTERNATIONAL BOAT BUILDING TRAINING COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window