YOUTH CENTRE PLAYGROUP (LYMINGTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school for children aged 2yrs - 4yrs 11mths offering day care and education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £100,689 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Hampshire
Governance
- 24 May 1994: Standard registration
- PENNINGTON VILLAGE PRESCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chelsea Lambert | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Newland | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Hurford | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Deller | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.00k | £156.55k | £164.82k | £156.93k | £116.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.00k | £141.07k | £152.64k | £151.89k | £151.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £81.00k | £140.93k | £143.75k | N/A | £100.69k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £450 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2023
(These accounts |
16 May 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 16 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pennington Village Pre-school
c/o Pennington Infant School
Pennington
Pennington
Hants
SO41 8HX
- Phone:
- 01590610925
- Website:
-
penningtonpreschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window