BUBWITH UNDER 5'S
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school for children aged between 2 1/2 - 4 1/2.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 23 May 1994: Standard registration
- 20 October 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2015 | 28/02/2016 | 28/02/2017 | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.69k | £41.55k | £29.37k | £23.85k | £27.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.59k | £39.08k | £32.61k | £28.04k | £30.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £28.74k | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 19 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | 19 December 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2018 | 23 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2017 | 23 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
28 February 2017
(These accounts |
23 October 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/02/1994 AS AMENDED ON 01/06/2012
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window