Financial history GREENHILL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1037862
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £132.75k £91.95k £95.29k £91.82k £77.66k
Total expenditure £114.49k £77.33k £74.19k £76.99k £60.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £513 £1.74k N/A N/A