COULSDON AND PURLEY FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1037897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A music, speech and drama festival with competence classes for piano, musical instruments, recorder, singers, school choirs, adult choirs etc caters for all ages.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £18,707
Total expenditure: £18,587

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Croydon
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Walter Hanesworth Trustee 02 November 2022
None on record
MALCOLM HEATH DALTON Trustee 05 October 2011
SANDERSTEAD UNITED REFORMED CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £13.75k £6.26k £15.06k £14.72k £18.71k
Total expenditure £12.67k £2.77k £15.84k £16.34k £18.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 02 April 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 19 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 KENDALL AVENUE SOUTH
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 0QR
Phone:
02086607939