Financial history TRUMAN ENTERPRISE NARROWBOAT TRUST

Charity number: 1037914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.54k £4.44k £5.70k £12.24k £18.09k
Total expenditure £14.32k £5.84k £6.74k £9.64k £14.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A