TRUMAN ENTERPRISE NARROWBOAT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide and operate narrowboats for youth, community and family groups including disabled, disadvantaged and elderly groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
Governance
- 24 May 1994: Standard registration
- HF TRUMAN MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- H F TRUMAN NARROWBOAT COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN JOHN JORDAN | Chair | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ROGERS | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.54k | £4.44k | £5.70k | £12.24k | £18.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.32k | £5.84k | £6.74k | £9.64k | £14.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 SEPTEMBER 1991 AND DEED OF AMENDMENT MADE 18 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE AND TRAIN YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDENT IN WALSALL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN WALSALL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WHO ARE DISABLED DISADVANTAGED OR ELDERLY BY THE PROVISION OPERATION AND MAINTENANCE OF A SUITABLE BOAT FOR EDUCATION RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
WALSALL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
145 Stafford Road
Bloxwich
WALSALL
West Midlands
WS3 3PG
- Phone:
- 07763214524
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window