ST OSWALD'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No longer providing any service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Warrington
Governance
- 24 May 1994: Standard registration
- ST OSWALDS PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA MCERLAINE | Chair | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jenny McQuilton | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAWN MICHELLE BATE | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.94k | £53.63k | £41.83k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.63k | £51.78k | £43.79k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £42.00k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £41.93k | £25.30k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1054 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1054 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JUNE 1992 AS AMENDED 29 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Oswald's Pre-School
Padgate Lane
Warrington
WA1 3PE
- Phone:
- 01925817617
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window