CORBY GLEN PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1037934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity runs a playgroup for children between the ages of 2 and 5. We provide care for chidlren in a rural area covering Corby Glen, Swinstead, Irnham, Burton Coggles, Swayfield, Creeton, Little Bytham, Castle Bytham and Careby.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £162,738
Total expenditure: £147,910

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 May 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
catherine earth Trustee 11 May 2023
CORBY GLEN PRESCHOOL
Recently registered
Rosie Sydall Trustee 11 April 2023
None on record
Charlotte Mead Trustee 29 March 2023
CORBY GLEN PRESCHOOL
Recently registered
Catherine Mcgillivray Trustee 29 March 2023
CORBY GLEN PRESCHOOL
Recently registered
Kelly Harty Trustee 16 February 2023
CORBY GLEN PRESCHOOL
Recently registered
Samantha Steele Trustee 11 June 2022
CORBY GLEN PRESCHOOL
Recently registered
Sarah Fowler Trustee 02 February 2022
CORBY GLEN PRESCHOOL
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £82.25k £89.09k £76.78k £126.79k £162.74k
Total expenditure £81.51k £84.36k £81.09k £119.37k £147.91k
Income from government contracts N/A £58.57k £37.30k £49.40k N/A
Income from government grants £72.66k £5.78k N/A N/A £84.47k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 07 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 07 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 08 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 24 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 24 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 22 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RON DAWSON MEMORIAL HALL
SWINSTEAD ROAD
CORBY GLEN
GRANTHAM
NG33 4NU
Phone:
07951918138