Financial history HOLY TRINITY PRE-SCHOOL (NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME)

Charity number: 1037957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £40.85k £45.52k £47.76k £49.28k £44.35k
Total expenditure £46.40k £43.23k £52.20k £47.65k £47.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A