Accounts and annual returns PENCOMBE UNDER FIVES

Charity number: 1037961
Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 September 2024 584 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 September 2024 584 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 June 2022 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 July 2022 169 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 June 2022 507 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 July 2022 534 days late Download Open in new window