Financial history DERWENTWATER SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1037983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.74k £3.60k £6.14k £8.05k £10.71k
Total expenditure £13.51k £523 £6.96k £7.30k £15.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A