SPRINGFIELD LOWER SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide financial assistance to the school

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 May 1994: Standard registration
  • 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 19 February 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leanne Trudgill Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Jody Hull Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £2.26k £880 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £10.17k £105 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 September 2023 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 August 2020 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Ripon Close
Kempston
BEDFORD
MK42 8UZ
Phone:
07538046491
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available